Ruddock, Nicholas Strickland (CPSO#: 24477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Grange Street
Guelph ON  N1E 2T6
Phone: (519) 823 1753
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Ruddock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ruddock ( CPSO# 24477 )

Business Address:
302 - 85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-1871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS STRICKLAND RUDDOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDDOCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1977