Ruddy, James (CPSO#: 64768)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Nov 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Nov 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Nov 1995