Ruddy, Terrence David (CPSO#: 51536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Of Ottawa Heart Institut
40 Ruskin Street
Roomm H1220
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7267
Fax: (613) 6967248
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terrence Ruddy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ruddy ( CPSO# 51536 )
Dr. K. Ascah ( CPSO# 50095 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4085


Corporation Name: Kathryn Ascah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ruddy ( CPSO# 51536 )
Dr. K. Ascah ( CPSO# 50095 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Suite H-1220B
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4688

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRENCE DAVID RUDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDDY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986