Rudich, Zvia (CPSO#: 77321)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004