Rudky, Rina (CPSO#: 72564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Humber River Regional Hospital
Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: (416-242-1025
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rina Rudky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RINA RUDKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003