Rudland, Randolph Barry (CPSO#: 92468)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia
Manitoba
Newfoundland and Labrador

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016