Rudyk, Mary Kathryn (CPSO#: 30969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Senior Health Centre
1709A South 16th Street
Wilmington NC  28401
United States
Phone: (910) 392-2525
Fax: (910) 392-2827

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY KATHRYN RUDYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDYK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1979