Ruel, Daniel Robert (CPSO#: 71124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5881 Malden Road
La Salle ON  N9H 1S5
Phone: (519) 966-3411
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Ruel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ruel ( CPSO# 71124 )

Business Address:
5881 Malden Road
La Salle ON  N9H 1S5
Phone Number: (519) 966-3411

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL ROBERT RUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999