Ruel, Marc Andre (CPSO#: 71094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3402
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7288
Fax: (613) 696-7116
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Ruel Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ruel ( CPSO# 71094 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
3402 - 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7288


Corporation Name: David Glineur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Glineur ( CPSO# 105651)
Dr. M. Ruel ( CPSO# 71094 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Suite 3402
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4626


Corporation Name: Juan Grau Alvaro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grau Alvaro ( CPSO# 110759)
Dr. M. Ruel ( CPSO# 71094 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Suite 3403
40 rue Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 761-4626

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC ANDRE RUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002