Ruggiero, Donato Anthony (CPSO#: 24397)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 14 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.A. Ruggiero Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2015
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 09 Jul 2015
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 14 Oct 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Aug 2016
Summary:

On August 23, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Donato Anthony Ruggiero committed an act of professional misconduct 
in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient by placing his penis in the patient’s 
vagina during a medical appointment in his office in approximately 1986. 
 
Dr. Ruggiero received his certificate of registration in 1973. He had a solo practice in 
Toronto at the relevant time.  
 
Patient A attended Dr. Ruggiero’s office for abdominal pain in or about 1986, when she was in 
her late teens. The Committee found that Patient A had three appointments with Dr. Ruggiero.  
 
On Patient A’s last visit with Dr. Ruggiero, she was asked to remove her clothing from the waist 
down and to lie on the examination table and place her feet in the stirrups.  
 
The Committee rejected Dr. Ruggiero’s evidence that he performed a pelvic 
examination at Patient A’s last visit, and that she mistook the examination for sexual 
impropriety.   
 
The Committee found that when Dr. Ruggiero asked Patient A to undress from the 
waist down and lie down on the examination table, it was not his intention to perform a 
medically-indicated pelvic examination. Rather, his true intent was to take advantage 
and exploit a vulnerable patient by inserting his penis into her vagina for self-
gratification.  
 
The Committee found that Dr. Ruggiero was being deceptive when he provided 
College investigators, the Committee, and Patient A’s mother with various 
explanations for why he would have performed a pelvic examination.  These 
explanations did not have a factual basis and were merely attempts to provide a 
legitimate explanation for why he would have asked Patient A to undress from the 
waist down and lie on the examination table for a purported pelvic examination.  
Dr. Ruggiero spontaneously described Patient A to a College investigator as having 
been dressed “very, very seductively” the day of the assault, and he recalled her 
appearance.  Dr. Ruggiero also testified that Patient A was not a virgin when he saw 
her.  The Committee found that Dr. Ruggiero perceived Patient A in a sexualized 
manner.  
 
The Committee found that Patient A raised her head to see what was going on during 
the appointment, and saw Dr. Ruggiero’s pants unzipped and his penis with a condom 
on it going in and out of her vagina, while hearing him moaning.  
 
The Committee did not find Dr. Ruggiero to be a credible witness. There were 
numerous inconsistencies in his testimony. The Committee found Patient A to be a 
credible witness and her testimony to be reliable. 
 
In his conduct towards Patient A, Dr. Ruggiero committed an act of professional 
misconduct, in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient. 


 
 

 
PENALTY 
 
On October 14, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   -  The Registrar revoke Dr. Ruggiero’s certificate of registration, effective 
      immediately; 
   -  Dr. Ruggiero appear before the panel to be reprimanded within sixty (60) days 
      of this Order becoming final; and 
   -  Dr. Ruggiero pay costs to the College in the amount of $25,000.00 within thirty 
      (30) days of the date of this Order becoming final. 
 
APPEAL 
 
On October 31, 2016, Dr. Ruggiero appealed the decisions on both liability and 
penalty of the Discipline Committee dated August 23, 2016 and October 14, 2016 to 
the Divisional Court of the Superior Court of Justice. 
 
On May 1, 2017, Dr. Ruggiero abandoned his appeal to the Divisional Court.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Third Party Records Motions: August 31, 2015; Hearing: January 4-6, February 1, 2016 Penalty Hearing : October 14, 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 1, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Donato Anthony Ruggiero to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 1, 2017:

Dr. Ruggiero’s certificate of registration was revoked by the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of sexual impropriety with a patient on October 14, 2016.

In a Notice of Hearing dated September 9, 2015, May 5, 2016, and February 14, 2017, Dr. Ruggiero was referred to discipline on further allegations of professional misconduct, namely failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, sexual abuse of a patient, and having engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

College investigations were also conducted into whether Dr. Ruggiero engaged in professional misconduct or was incompetent in his general practice and into whether he engaged in professional misconduct regarding his submission of claims to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.

Prior to these investigations and allegations being resolved, Dr. Ruggiero agreed never to apply or re-apply to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, nor to apply for reinstatement of his certificate of registration.
Download Full Document (PDF)