Ruisi, Vincent Joseph (CPSO#: 98599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1275 Walker Road Unit 2
Windsor ON  N8Y 4X9
Phone: (519) 253-9116
Fax: (519) 253-5404
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Ruisi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ruisi ( CPSO# 98599 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
1275 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8Y 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 253-9116

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT JOSEPH RUISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUISI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014