Ruiter-Ligeti, Jacob Julius (CPSO#: 107905)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Thomas Jefferson University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jul 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2015 to 25 Sep 2015
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2015 to 04 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2016 to 07 Feb 2016
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2016