Ruiz Mirazo, Eider (CPSO#: 96641)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the Basque Country, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 21 Oct 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2013