Rukundo, Godfrey Zari (CPSO#: 87828)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mbarara University of Science & Technolo, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Oct 2007 to 21 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 22 Nov 2007 to 01 Apr 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2008