Rumball, Kevin Michael (CPSO#: 58458)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001