Rumball, William James Stuart (CPSO#: 17653)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1959
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1960
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 May 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013