Rumm, Ellen Beverly Hillary (CPSO#: 72532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
100 Stokes Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34354
Fax: (416) 979-4297
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 1010
170 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1T9
Canada
Phone: (416) 963-4304
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELLEN BEVERLY HILLARY RUMM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUMM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003