Runciman, Kenneth Allan Craig (CPSO#: 58148)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Powassan and Area Medical Centre 8 King Street Powassan, ON P0H 1Z0
Date Received: 03 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2015