Rundle, Margaret Agnes (CPSO#: 60956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 291-7719
Fax: (416) 287-3775
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET AGNES RUNDLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUNDLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1990