Rungi, Arne Alexander (CPSO#: 83205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arne A. Rungi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rungi ( CPSO# 83205 )

Business Address:
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 5K3
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARNE ALEXANDER RUNGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUNGI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 01 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 02 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007