Rupesinghe, Lalitha Isolde (CPSO#: 61245)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1997
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002