Rusak, Anysia Marie (CPSO#: 59335)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2006