Rusen, David Samuel (CPSO#: 30220)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 7, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise undertaking given by Dr. David Samuel Rusen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 7, 2015: Dr. Rusen has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.