Rush, Perry Joel (CPSO#: 52364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5927 Bathurst Street
Suite 202
North York ON  M2R 3T5
Phone: (416) 225-0040
Fax: (416) 225-0048
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. John's Rehabilitation Hospital
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Canada
Phone: (416) 226-6780
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
North York ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PERRY JOEL RUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1983