Russell, Elizabeth Lucie (CPSO#: 71352)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hollidge Medical Centre
Unit B6
130 Hollidge Boulevard
Aurora ON  L4G 8A3
Phone: (905) 841-5554
Fax: (905) 841-0088
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth L. Russell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 71352 )

Business Address:
Hollidge Medical Centre
Suite B6
130 Hollidge Boulevard
Aurora ON  L4G 8A3
Phone Number: (905) 841-5554

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH LUCIE RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999