Russell, Jocelyn Mary (CPSO#: 80348)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
Unit 300
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Electoral District: 07

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 05 Oct 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOCELYN MARY RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Dec 2003 to 09 Jan 2004
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2004