Russell, Joseph Randolph (CPSO#: 22433)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Ellesmere Xray Associates, 2880 Ellesmere Road, Scarborough, ON M1E 4B8
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015