Russell, Laurie Jane Macgregor (CPSO#: 59175)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1998