Russell, Mary Lynn (CPSO#: 24568)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 15 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Apr 2002