Russell, Nicholas Christie (CPSO#: 18494)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Mar 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007