Russell, Steven Andrew (CPSO#: 103491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-548-3232
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN ANDREW RUSSELL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RUSSELL is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. RUSSELL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RUSSELL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. RUSSELL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RUSSELL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RUSSELL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018