Russell-Mahoney, Barbara Lynn (CPSO#: 67107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: Russell, Barbara Lynn (used until: 21 Aug 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hugh Allen Clinic
P.O. Box 489
79-5th ave. North
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1A8
Phone: (807) 737-3803
Fax: (807) 737-1771
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA LYNN RUSSELL-MAHONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL-MAHONEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1996