Russillo, Balbina (CPSO#: 60322)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2000