Rustad, Clare Ada (CPSO#: 98076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARE ADA RUSTAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSTAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2014