Rutherford, Kathryn Lynn (CPSO#: 95346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westend Family Care Clinic
80 Michael Cowpland
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ng Rutherford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ng ( CPSO# 86356 )
Dr. K. Rutherford ( CPSO# 95346 )

Business Address:
Westend Family Care Clinic
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN LYNN RUTHERFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUTHERFORD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2013