Rutherford, Patricia Anne (CPSO#: 74693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Niagara Mental health
167 Main St E
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Phone: 905 309-3336
Fax: 905 309-4446
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Niagara Mental Health
167A Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Canada
Phone: (905) 309-3336
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia Rutherford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rutherford ( CPSO# 74693 )

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
167A Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Phone Number: (905) 309-3336

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Psychiatry
50 Charlton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANNE RUTHERFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUTHERFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2006