Rutherford, Paul Allan (CPSO#: 19820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 1966

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Terry Suggitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Suggitt ( CPSO# 77060 )
Dr. P. Rutherford ( CPSO# 19820 )
Dr. A. Qureshi ( CPSO# 58128 )
Dr. B. Matthews ( CPSO# 58936 )
Dr. R. Latuskie ( CPSO# 66312 )
Dr. G. Edmonds ( CPSO# 76383 )
Dr. R. Annis ( CPSO# 59933 )
Dr. L. Hayward ( CPSO# 95251 )
Dr. D. Gateman ( CPSO# 100625)
Dr. R. Warren ( CPSO# 52853 )

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1966
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 1, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Paul Allan
            Rutherford, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Rutherford to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Rutherford has voluntarily ceased to practise anesthesiology in all
                  jurisdictions effective July 1, 2015.