Rutherford, Reginald John (CPSO#: 51544)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993