Rutherford, Susan Mildred (CPSO#: 33473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
2494 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1K9
Phone: (416) 699-9035
Fax: (416) 699-9063
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Rutherford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rutherford ( CPSO# 33473 )

Business Address:
Suite 14
1450 O'Connor Drive
Toronto ON  M4B 2T8
Phone Number: (416) 699-9035

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MILDRED RUTHERFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUTHERFORD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1985