Rutka, James Thomas (CPSO#: 51545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery
555 University Avenue
Suite 1503
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6425
Fax: (416) 813-4975
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 06 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES THOMAS RUTKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUTKA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989