Ruzicka, Marcel (CPSO#: 69954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
Suite 5-21
1967 Riverside
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82535
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Hypertension Unit Room 360
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4521
Fax: (613) 761-4521
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcel Ruzicka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ruzicka ( CPSO# 69954 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Fifth Floor
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Hospital,Religious Hospitallers of St Joseph, Cornwall Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCEL RUZICKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUZICKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2002