Ryan, Clodagh Mai (CPSO#: 80287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Respirology
585 University Avenue
9 North Wing Room 967
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4719
Fax: (416) 340-4197
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLODAGH MAI RYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 23 Jan 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 16 Feb 2006
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2007