Ryan, Edward Anthony Joseph (CPSO#: 27400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
56 Aberfoyle Crescent
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2W4
Phone: (416) 231-4100
Fax: (416) 231-0845
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CREATE Fertility center
Womans and Sunnybrook Hospital Fert
11th Floor 790 Bay street
Toronto ON  W5S 2X9
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7727
Fax: (416) 323-7334
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

CREATE Fertility center
Womans and Sunnybrook Hospital ART
11th Floor 790 Bay street
Toronto ON  W5S 2X9
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7727
Fax: (416) 323-7334
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 14 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 14, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Edward Anthony Joseph
            Ryan, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ryan to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                    DR. EDWARD ANTHONY JOSEPH RYAN
                                             ("Dr. Ryan")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "public register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Ryan, certificate of registration number 27400, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.
                  
            (4)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of twelve (12) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of
                         the Clinical Supervisor(s). The Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at
                        minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review all materials provided to him/her, and have an initial
                              meeting with me to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Thereafter, meet with me once every two (2) weeks for three
                              (3) months (6 visits), followed by monthly visits for three
                              (3) months (3 visits).  If, after that has been completed,
                              the Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves,
                              the Clinical Supervisor will meet with me once every three
                              (3) months for six (6) months (2 visits).  Otherwise, we will
                              continue to meet monthly until the Clinical Supervisor is of
                              the opinion that the frequency of supervision can be reduced
                              and the College agrees;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month for six (6) months, and once every three (3) months
                              thereafter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                              has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the
                        medical inspector dated April 14, 2016, and concerns that may arise
                        during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Ryan, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (4)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Ryan, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (4)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    the management of Ovarian Hyperstimulation Syndrome
                                    directed at practising infertility specialists; and
                  
                              2.    the Medical Record-Keeping course offered by the
                                    University of Toronto;
                  
                        (ii)  a written summary of the following, which I will provide to
                              my Clinical Supervisor:
                  
                                    -the relevant guidelines on the Diagnosis and
                                    Management of Ovarian Hyperstimulation Syndrome from
                                    the Society of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, the
                                    American Society of Reproductive Medicine and the
                                    Canadian Fertility and Andrology Society;
                                    -the CPSO Policy on Medical Records; and
                                    -the CPSO Practice Guide;
                  
                        (iii) a review of CMPA modules on medical record-keeping;
                  
                        (iv)  all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (v)   any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (5)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (5)(a).
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to complete the elements of my professional
                        education program specified in subparagraphs 5(a)(i), 5(a)(ii) and
                        5(a)(iii) by November 1, 2016  or, if no satisfactory program is
                        available by that time, by the first possible opportunity
                        thereafter.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (4) above
                        and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of
                        my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ryan, understand and agree that if I am of the view that any
                        of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR Committee
                        will consider my submissions and make a determination regarding
                        whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable
                        and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (6)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Ryan, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (6)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ryan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Ryan, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the public register during the time period that
                  the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Ryan, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  public register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in
                  effect:

                        Dr. Ryan was the subject of a College investigation into whether he
                        engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his
                        fertility medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              -Dr. Ryan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 12
                              months; 
                              -Dr. Ryan will engage in professional education in
                              infertility medicine and medical record-keeping; and
                              -Dr. Ryan's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Ryan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Ryan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Ryan, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the professional education set out in section (5) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (5) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Edward Anthony Joseph Ryan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 14, 2016:

Dr. Ryan was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his fertility medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Ryan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 12 months;
Dr. Ryan will engage in professional education in infertility medicine and medical record-keeping; and
Dr. Ryan’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.