Ryan, Gail Lynn (CPSO#: 68229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Anesthesiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2431
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ToothPark
2012 Tenth Line Road
Ottawa ON  K4A 4X4
Canada
Phone: 613-837-6800
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Carling Surgicentre
100-2255 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7Z5
Canada
Phone: (613) 828-2230
Fax: (613) 828-1771
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Orleans Surgicentre
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K1C 1T1
Canada
Phone: (613) 829-6218
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gail L. Ryan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ryan ( CPSO# 68229 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Anaesthesia
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2431

Business Address:
Suite 100
2255 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7Z5
Phone Number: (613) 828-2230

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAIL LYNN RYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999