Ryan, Gregory Charles Edmond Harold (CPSO#: 53249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gaelic, German

Education:National University of Ireland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue
OPG 3-906
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8415
Fax: (416) 586-8617
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Greg Ryan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salter ( CPSO# 52377 )
Dr. G. Ryan ( CPSO# 53249 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue
OPG 3-906
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8415

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY CHARLES EDMOND HAROLD RYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1987