Ryan, John Gerard (CPSO#: 63161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613 737 8899 Ext. 73249
Fax: 613 737 8207
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John G. Ryan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ryan ( CPSO# 63161 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Diagnostic Imaging
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4221

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Missouri

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN GERARD RYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1990