Ryan, Lerato Mathepe Ann (CPSO#: 87019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: (613) 721-4770
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Fax: (705) 267-6311
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

College Square Medical Clinic
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Canada
Phone: (613) 224-6606
Fax: (613) 224-6162
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Smiths Falls District Hospital
60 Cornelia St West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Fax: (613) 283-8990
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lerato Ryan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ryan ( CPSO# 87019 )

Business Address:
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Business Address:
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Phone Number: (613) 224-6606

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LERATO MATHEPE ANN RYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2009