Ryan, Mili Singh (CPSO#: 82635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
262 Oxford St East Suite 104
London ON  N6A 1T8
Phone: (519) 675-9624
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Ryan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ryan ( CPSO# 82635 )
Dr. S. Ryan ( CPSO# 82670 )

Business Address:
South Huron Medical Centre
23 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-3343

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILI SINGH RYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2010