Ryan, Sean Paul (CPSO#: 82670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Huron Medical Centre
23 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 235-3343
Fax: (519) 235-3845
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Ryan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ryan ( CPSO# 82635 )
Dr. S. Ryan ( CPSO# 82670 )

Business Address:
South Huron Medical Centre
23 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-3343

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Huron Hospital Exeter
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN PAUL RYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2006 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2007