Ryglewicz, Kamila Joanna (CPSO#: 85718)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: Bekasiak, Kamila Joanna (used until: 31 May 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 979-7878
Fax: (519) 979-7872
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. and K. Ryglewicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ryglewicz ( CPSO# 94478 )
Dr. K. Ryglewicz ( CPSO# 85718 )

Business Address:
201 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 979-7878

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMILA JOANNA RYGLEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RYGLEWICZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009